Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985422

EP0985422 - Humidity and bacterial protection for medical components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet Critical Care AB
Röntgenvägen 2
171 95 Solna / SE
[2004/13]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Siemens-Elema AB
Röntgenvägen 2
171 95 Solna 1 / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Skog, Göran
Hildebrandsvägen 32
168 56 Bromma / SE
02 / Wallén, Lars
Järneksvägen 16
163 47 Spanga / SE
03 / Arvidsson, Carl-Erik
Östervägen 9b
171 39 Solna / SE
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Stein, Jan , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/33]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/13]Samzelius, Roger Mikael , et al
Maquet Critical Care AB Patent Department
171 95 Solna / SE
Application number, filing date99116227.217.08.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateSE1998000304709.09.1998         Original published format: SE 9803047
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985422
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0985422
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985422
Date:01.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/08
[2000/49]
Former International [2000/11]A61M16/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2001/34]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Feuchtigkeits- und Bakterienbarriere für medizinische Komponenten[2000/11]
English:Humidity and bacterial protection for medical components[2000/11]
French:Protection contre l'humidité et les bactéries pour des composants médicaux[2000/11]
Examination procedure05.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
30.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2007Fee for grant paid
12.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5789660  (KOFOED SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 43; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]US4558708  (LABUDA LAWRENCE L [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 35; figure - *;
 [A]WO8602820  (ANDROS ANALYZERS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0510377  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US])
by applicantEP0841083
 US5419326
 SE9801007