Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992734

EP0992734 - Compression of liquids and gas supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Leopoldstrasse 252
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Leopoldstrasse 252
80807 München / DE
Former [2002/06]For all designated states
Linde AG
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Linde Gas AG
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Linde Technische Gase GmbH
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Adler, Robert
Lorenz Steinergasse 34
2201 Gerasdorf / AT
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Patent und Marken
Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/35]Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/15]Obermüller, Bernhard
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date99116241.317.08.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199813923328.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19839233
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992734
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992734
Date:13.12.2006
[2006/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:F17C9/00, F04B15/08, F04B53/16
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Verdichten von Flüssigkeiten und Gasversorgungsanlage[2000/15]
English:Compression of liquids and gas supply apparatus[2000/15]
French:Compression de liquides et installation d'alimentation en gaz[2000/15]
Examination procedure17.04.2007Examination requested  [2007/22]
01.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/45]
29.06.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[XY]US1937859  (THOMAS ROSSWELL W) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11,13-16,18,19 * column 1, lines 23-28,44-51 * * column 4, line 118 * [Y] 5,8,12,17;
 [XY]EP0586294  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 13 * page 4, lines 24,33-35,58 * * page 5, lines 19-21, 35, 43-44 * [Y] 5,8,12,17;
 [A]DE629833  (MEAF MACH EN APPARATEN FAB NV) [A] 1-19 * page 2, lines 6-11 *;
 [A]US5214925  (HOY KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 5, lines 14-61 * * column 6, lines 11-34 *;
 [A]DE3135726  (SCRABACK ERNST) [A] 1-19 * claim 6 * * page 8, line 17 *;
 [A]FR2672942  (EBARA INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 26 *;
 [A]DE355657  (MICHAEL ZACK) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2613034  (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1-19 * page 1, lines 25-36 *;
 [A]DE1728148  (LINDE AG) [A] 1-19 * page 2, lines 5-7 *