Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990727

EP0990727 - Polycarboxy/polyol fiberglass binder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johns Manville International Inc.
717 17th Street
Denver, CO 80217 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Taylor, Thomas J.
7126 South Oneida Circle
Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US
02 / Bristol, Derek C.
445 South 45th Street
Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 16 55
82306 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Grättinger & Partner (GbR)
Postfach 16 55
82306 Starnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99116458.321.08.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1998016556902.10.1998         Original published format: US 165569
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990727
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/64, C08F8/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polycarbonsäure/Polyol enthaltendes Bindemittel für Glasfaser[2000/14]
English:Polycarboxy/polyol fiberglass binder[2000/14]
French:Liant pour fibre de verre à base de polycarboxy/polyol[2000/14]
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
18.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
21.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/09]
25.01.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2010
03.03.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5661213  (ARKENS CHARLES THOMAS [US], et al) [XD] 1-20 * column 4, line 21 - line 31; example 18; claim -; table 14.1 *;
 [DX]US5318990  (STRAUSS CARL R [US]) [DX] 1-20 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 21; examples 3,4; table I * * column 3, line 22 - line 52 *;
 [X]EP0651088  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,15,17-20 * examples 9,11,14 * * page 5, line 9 - line 29; claims 1,2 *