Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992732

EP0992732 - Production of gas mixtures in large quantities [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For:DE  GB 
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH
Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5
40235 Düsseldorf / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Messer Group GmbH
Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c
65843 Sulzbach / DE
[2006/29]
Former [2006/12]For:DE  GB 
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH
Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5
40235 Düsseldorf / DE
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  DK  ES  FI  FR  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE 
Messer Group GmbH
Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
Messer Group GmbH
Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH
Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5
40235 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH
Fütingsweg 34
47805 Krefeld / DE
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH
Fütingsweg 34
47805 Krefeld / DE
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Messer Griesheim GmbH
Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6
65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH
Frankfurt Airport Center 1, C9, Hugo-Eckener-Ring
60547 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schroeder, Georg
Isenbergweg 8
44879 Bochum / DE
02 / Ritterbach, Heinz
Frankenstrasse 89
41462 Neuss / DE
03 / Schleser, Werner
Oestrumer Strasse 20
47228 Duisburg / DE
04 / Schmidt, Renate
Im Heckdahl 12
47249 Duisburg / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Kahlhöfer, Hermann , et al
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann
Rössler Heine PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/49]Kahlhöfer, Hermann , et al
Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99116523.424.08.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814628808.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846288
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992732
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992732
Date:03.05.2006
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:F17C5/06, B01F15/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2007/02]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Gasgemischen in grossen Mengen[2000/15]
English:Production of gas mixtures in large quantities[2000/15]
French:Préparation de mélanges de gaz en grandes quantités[2000/15]
Examination procedure04.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/29]
26.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.12.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.12.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.12.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3948281  (STRAIN DONNY R, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 13-19,58-68 * * column 2, lines 54,63-65 * * column 4, lines 26-33,44 * * column 5, lines 13-35 * * column 8, lines 35-46 *;
 [X]WO9814362  (ENRON LNG DEV CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 9-12 * * page 17, lines 25-28 * * page 22, lines 1-10 *;
 [X]US5385263  (KIRK KENNETH G [US], et al) [X] 7-11 * column 4, line 2 *;
 [X]US5803005  (STENNING DAVID G [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 20 * * column 2, lines 55-67 * * column 4, lines 51-67 *;
 [X]US4860803  (WELLS J MORGAN [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, paragraphs 15-13 * * column 2, line 38 *;
 [X]DE19704868  (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 1, lines 5-12,64-68 * * column 2, lines 22-27 * * column 3, lines 66-68 * * column 4, lines 1-5,43-50 * * column 6, lines 52-60 *;
 [X]EP0556753  (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 20 * * column 2, lines 30-58 * * column 3, lines 1-17 *;
 [X]GB1122817  (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH) [X] 1-3,11 * page 1, line 15 * * page 3, line 41 *;
 [X]US4219038  (LUBITZSCH WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *