EP0982472 - Sealing assembly for tunnel segments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarmac Limited Millfields Road Ettingshall Wolverhampton WV4 6JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Tarmac Limited Millfields Road Ettingshall, Wolverhampton WV4 6JP / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Tarmac Heavy Building Materials UK Limited Millfields Road Ettingshall, Wolverhampton WV4 6JP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gimbert, Alan William Applewood, Main Street Fiskerton, Nottinghamshire NG25 0UL / GB | 02 /
Whitham, Robert Paul Marlock Meadow, Moor Lane Morton, Nottinghamshire NG25 0UX / GB | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Lucking, David John, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lucking, David John, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Lucking, David John, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116570.5 | 24.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | GB19980018489 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9818489 | GB19990015764 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9915764 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982472 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982472 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Dichtanordnung für Tunnel-Segmente | [2000/09] | English: | Sealing assembly for tunnel segments | [2000/09] | French: | Systeme d'étancheité pour voussoir de tunnel | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.03.2003 | FI | 12.03.2003 | GR | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | DK | 12.06.2003 | SE | 12.06.2003 | PT | 16.06.2003 | CY | 24.08.2003 | LU | 24.08.2003 | IE | 25.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | BE | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
CY | 24.08.2003 | ||
LU | 24.08.2003 | ||
IE | 25.08.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
CY | 24.08.2003 | ||
LU | 24.08.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | BE | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
CY | 24.08.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | BE | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | BE | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2305584 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]); | [A]DE8521040U (PHOENIX) [A] 1,4,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0306581 (JOINT FRANCAIS [FR]) [A] 1-3,6-11,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3934198 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9107571 (DAETWYLER AG [CH]) [A] 1,16 * abstract *; | [A]GB2241973 (COSTAIN BUILDING PROD [GB]) [A] 1,6,7,16; | [A]EP0534277 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) [A] 1,12,13,16 * abstract *; | [A]FR2712655 (TUYAUX BONNA [FR]); | [A]DE19519244 (PHOENIX AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-16 * abstract *; | [A]CH686383 (DOTWYLER AG SCHWEIZERISCHE KAB [CH]); | [A]EP0741231 (TRELLEBORG BAKKER B V [NL]) | by applicant | GB2197917 |