blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993061


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
30.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
06.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2005  [2005/25]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
15.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
15.04.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.06.2005  [2005/22]
25.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
24.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.02.2005  [2005/06]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
05.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
23.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
08.04.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.03.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.11.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.11.2003 Change - applicant published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
25.10.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2003 Examination report or reply
13.06.2003 Examination report or reply
04.04.2003 Examination report or reply
14.01.2003 Change - extension states
22.11.2002 Examination report or reply
22.11.2002 First examination report
01.11.2002 Request for examination filed published on  18.12.2002  [2002/51]
25.10.2002 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
16.09.2002 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
13.09.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
23.07.2002 Renewal fee
15.03.2002 Change - representative published on  02.05.2002  [2002/18]
28.12.2001 Publication of search report published on  13.02.2002  [2002/07]
11.06.2001 Renewal fee
24.03.2000 Change - applicant published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]