blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993061
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59909680D 15.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE59909680 26.08.1999
DE19845668 05.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0993061Global Dossier 09.06.2004B1
EP0993061 13.02.2002A3
EP0993061 12.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19845668 05.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT268947T 15.06.2004T
Priority number Date
DE19845668 05.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19845668 06.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19845668 05.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2222641T 01.02.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE19845668 05.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6335115 01.01.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE19845668 05.10.1998