Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993061

EP0993061 - Secondary lithium ion cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VARTA Automotive Systems GmbH
Am Leineufer 51
30419 Hannover / DE
[2004/02]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
NBT GmbH
Am Leineufer 51
30419 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
VARTA Aktiengesllschaft
Am Leineufer 51
30419 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Meissner, Eberhard, Dr.
Iltisweg 10a
65719 Hofheim / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Lins, Edgar , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur. , et al
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
Former [2000/15]Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentassessor, Frankenallee 22/1. Stock
65779 Kelkheim / DE
Application number, filing date99116661.226.08.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814566805.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19845668
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993061
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993061
Date:13.02.2002
[2002/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993061
Date:09.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/40, H01M10/42
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Sekundäre Lithium-Ionen-Zelle[2000/15]
English:Secondary lithium ion cell[2000/15]
French:Pile rechargeable à ions lithium[2000/15]
Examination procedure14.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2004Fee for grant paid
06.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
01.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
AT26.08.2004
LU26.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
PT09.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]CY09.06.2004
FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
AT26.08.2004
LU26.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2006/13]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
AT26.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/51]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/25]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/23]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI09.06.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE09.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH08190934  ;
 [X]EP0867954  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 22 - column 4, line 27 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 3 * * column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 35 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]JPH08162163  ;
 [X]US5759715  (BARKER JEREMY [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 15 - column 2, line 54 * * column 6, line 14 - column 6, line 41 * * column 8, line 11 - column 8, line 14 *;
 [DA]DE19528049  (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 44 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, [X] 1,3 * abstract *