blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991301 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991301



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 80
17.10.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.11.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.10.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.10.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
14.06.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.06.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.06.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.06.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
15.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.03.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.03.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
13.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.11.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.09.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 10
01.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 2
01.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
01.09.1999 Description Search / examination 4
01.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6