blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991301
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59914053D 25.01.2007D1
Priority number Date
DE59914053 01.09.1999
DE19845009 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0991301Global Dossier 13.12.2006B1
EP0991301 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19845009 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT348495T 15.01.2007T
Priority number Date
DE19845009 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19845009 06.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19845009 30.09.1998