Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991301

EP0991301 - Window heating device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dierker, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing.
Potsdamer Ring 1
38550 Isenbüttel / DE
02 / Michels, Karsten, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Mühlengraben 13
D-38165 Lehre / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Bressel, Burkhard
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Bressel, Burkhard, Dr.
Effert, Bressel und Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radickestrasse 48
12489 Berlin (Adlershof) / DE
Application number, filing date99116820.401.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814500930.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19845009
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991301
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991301
Date:13.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/84
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Scheibenheizung für Kraftfahrzeuge[2000/14]
English:Window heating device for vehicles[2000/14]
French:Dispositif de chauffage des vitres d'un véhicule[2006/22]
Former [2000/14]Dispositif de chauffage des vitres d' un véhicule
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
21.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2006Fee for grant paid
24.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
FI13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
IT13.12.2006
NL13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
ES24.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
AT01.09.2007
LU01.09.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/50]DK13.12.2006
FI13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
IT13.12.2006
NL13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
ES24.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
AT01.09.2007
Former [2008/21]DK13.12.2006
FI13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
IT13.12.2006
NL13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
ES24.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
Former [2008/17]DK13.12.2006
FI13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
IT13.12.2006
NL13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
ES24.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
Former [2007/30]FI13.12.2006
NL13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US4357524  (APFELBECK OTTO L, et al) [X] 1,5,8,10 * column W *;
 [X]US5325912  (HOTTA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 3-5 *;
 [X]US4520258  (GROHMANN KURT [DE]) [X] 1,9 * column W *;
 [X]US5624591  (DI TRAPANI AGOSTINO [BE]) [X] 1,5 * column W *;
 [X]US4277672  (JONES DWIGHT V) [X] 1,5,8 * column W *;
 [X]US5496989  (BRADFORD MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column W *;
 [X]US5632917  (CUMMINS JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * column W *
ExaminationDE19705416