Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994273

EP0994273 - Balancing shaft for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For:ES  FR  GB  IT  SE 
Voigt, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Harxbütteler Strasse 8
38110 Braunschweig / DE
For:DE 
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]For:ES  FR  GB  IT  SE 
Voigt, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Harxbütteler Strasse 8
38110 Braunschweig / DE
For:DE 
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Voigt, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Harxbütteler Strasse 8
38110 Braunschweig / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99116847.703.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814765215.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847652
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994273
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994273
Date:21.08.2002
[2002/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/26
[2000/16]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/20]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ausgleichswelleneinheit für Verbrennungsmotoren[2000/16]
English:Balancing shaft for internal combustion engines[2000/16]
French:Arbre d'equilibrage pour moteurs à combustion interne[2000/16]
Examination procedure22.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
27.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0914353
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, [A] 1,2,5 * abstract *
by applicantUS4703725
 EP0789166
    - MZT, MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (1997), no. 58, pages 268 - 269,