blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0962187 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0962187



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
06.02.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 3
18.10.2001 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
18.10.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.10.2001 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.10.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
18.10.2001 Means of redress Search / examination 1
18.10.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
21.08.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.08.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.07.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
26.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 3
21.06.2001 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.05.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.05.2001 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.05.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 6
24.04.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 3
10.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
10.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
22.02.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.10.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.10.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.10.1999 Partial European search report Search / examination 2
05.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 27
05.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
03.09.1999 Description Search / examination 11
03.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
03.09.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
03.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7