Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990914

EP0990914 - Test appliance for connector with light conductor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TSK Prüfsysteme GmbH
Strengelrott 4
32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Mohme, Heinrich
Höferweg 1
32602 Vlotho / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date99116958.227.08.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE1998217515U01.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29817515 U
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990914
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990914
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/04
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Prüfeinrichtung für mit Lichtwellenleitern bestückte Stecker[2000/14]
English:Test appliance for connector with light conductor[2000/14]
French:Appareil de test d'un connecteur avec conducteur de lumiére[2000/14]
Examination procedure06.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
13.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/35]
08.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4673245  (KLING BERNARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 10, line 41 - column 11, line 41; figure 5 * * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 24; figure 1 * [Y] 4-6;
 [XY]FR2691264  (AEROSPATIALE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 16 - page 10, line 1; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5;
 [X]US5224186  (KISHIMOTO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0380722  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 4-6 * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 29; figure 3 *
 [XA]  KNOBLAUCH G ET AL, "STECKVERBINDER FUER KOMPONENTEN UND SYSTEME DER LICHTWELLENLEITERTECHNIK", TELCOM REPORT, SIEMENS AG. MUNCHEN, DE, (1983), vol. 6, ISSN 0344-4724, pages 102 - 108, XP000946273 [X] 1 * page 104, columns 1-3; figures 3,4 * [A] 2-6