Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990781

EP0990781 - Exhaust braking method for a supercharged engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Erwin
Goethestrasse 18
73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE
02 / Sumser, Siegfried
Im unteren Kienle 9
70184 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date99116963.227.08.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814457329.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844573
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990781
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990781
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990781
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D9/06
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/30]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Motorbremsverfahren für eine aufgeladene Brennkraftmaschine[2000/14]
English:Exhaust braking method for a supercharged engine[2000/14]
French:Méthode de frein moteur pour un moteur suralimenté[2000/14]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
14.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2004Fee for grant paid
14.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19637999  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,7,10,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 66; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19750331  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,12,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 34 - column 9, line 62; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE19727141  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 13 * column 4, line 15 - line 28 *;
 [A]WO9526466  (VOLVO AB [SE], et al)