Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987414

EP0987414 - V-type internal combustion engine for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nomura, Akifumi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Kanbe, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
 [2003/31]
Former [2000/12]01 / Nomura, Akifumi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Kanbe, Takashi
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
1-4-1 Chuo, Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
Representative(s)Liska, Horst , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99116978.027.08.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateJP1998026069514.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26069598
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987414
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987414
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987414
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02B75/22, F02B61/00, F02B61/02
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/12]F02B75/22, F02B61/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/36]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugbrennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart[2000/12]
English:V-type internal combustion engine for vehicle[2000/12]
French:Moteur à combustion interne à cylindres en pour un véhicule[2000/12]
Examination procedure08.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
13.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2003Fee for grant paid
20.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4903483  (ATSUUMI MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 34; figure - * [A] 3;
 [XA]US4960081  (ATSUUMI MAMORU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 8, line 10; figures 1-7 * [A] 3;
 [X]US4589382  (TSUBOI MASAHARU [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]JPS58119929
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831007), vol. 007, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 248), [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPS6483912