blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994182 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994182



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 165
09.03.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
21.11.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
28.05.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.05.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 43
11.07.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
28.03.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
07.01.2002 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
11.07.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
25.06.2001 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
29.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.04.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
05.02.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.02.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
01.02.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2001 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.08.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.1999 Description Search / examination 40
28.08.1999 Priority document Search / examination 44
28.08.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7