blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0994182


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.03.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.04.2004  [2004/18]
14.11.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.10.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.04.2003 Change - English title published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
03.09.2002 Loss of particular rights
02.09.2002 Renewal fee
12.07.2002 Loss of particular rights
23.04.2002 Change - extension states
25.03.2002 Loss of particular rights
04.01.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  20.02.2002  [2002/08]
02.01.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
20.07.2001 Renewal fee
20.07.2001 Request for examination filed published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
06.04.2001 Publication of search report published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
30.03.2001 Change - classification published on  16.05.2001 [2001/20]
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]