Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994182

EP0994182 - Process for the synchronisation of cell division of at least a population in a culture or mixed culture and preparation of at least a substance dependent of a cell cyclus by using the population obtained by the synchronised process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]Process for the synchronisation of cell division of at least a population in a culture or and preparation of at least a substance dependent of a cell cyclus by using the population obtained by the synchronised process
[2003/22]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schulz, Christoph, Dr.
Guntherweg 2
68199 Mannheim / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99116992.128.08.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199813958431.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19839584
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994182
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994182
Date:23.05.2001
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/16]C12N1/20
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL [2002/08]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Synchronisation von Zellteilungen mindestens einer Population in einer Kultur oder Mischkultur und zellzyklusabhängige Herstellung/Umsetzung von mindestens einer Substanz mit einer durch das Verfahren synchronisierten Population in einer Kultur oder Mischkultur[2000/16]
English:Process for the synchronisation of cell division of at least a population in a culture or mixed culture and preparation of at least a substance dependent of a cell cyclus by using the population obtained by the synchronised process[2003/22]
French:Procédé pour la synchronisation de la division cellulaire d' au moins une population dans une culture ou une culture mixte et préparation d'au moins une substance par utilisation de la population obtenue par le procédé synchronisé[2003/22]
Former [2000/16]Process for the synchronisation of cell division of at least a population in a culture or and preparation of at least a substance dependent of a cell cyclus by using the population obtained by the synchronised process
Former [2000/16]Procédé pour la synchronisation de la division cellulaire d' au moins une population dans une culture et préparation d'au moins une substance par utilisation de la population obtenue par le procédé synchronisé
Examination procedure12.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
24.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT, SE
28.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/18]
21.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9734996  (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [A] * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 30, line 16 - page 31, line 23 * * example 9 *;
 [A]JPH02182184  ;
 [A]US3979259  (JOHAN BELA, et al) [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 34, Database accession no. 1990-258256, XP002163722 & JPH02182184 A 19900716 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract *