Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965453

EP0965453 - Ink ribbon unit for thermal transfer colour printer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha TEC
570 Ohito, Ohito-cho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka 410-23 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kaname, Iga
9, Nirayamadotewada, Nirayamacho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Mitsuharu, Endo
531-12, Hiramatsu
Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Hiroyuki, Kushida
2816, Kayama
Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Takashi, Ichikawa
802-2, Kashiya, Kannamicho
Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1999/51]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date99116997.028.09.1996
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateJP1995025422429.09.1995         Original published format: JP 25422495
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965453
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965453
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0965453
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/325, B41J31/00
[1999/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/51]
TitleGerman:Farbbandeinheit für thermischen übertragungsfarbdrucker[1999/51]
English:Ink ribbon unit for thermal transfer colour printer[1999/51]
French:Unité à ruban encreur pour imprimante couleur de type à transfert thermique[1999/51]
Examination procedure28.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
05.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2002Fee for grant paid
27.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96115608.0  / EP0765760
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS587393  ;
 [A]JPS6168270  ;
 [A]EP0050481  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,17 * figures 6,10,14; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0692037  ;
 [A]EP0492356  (FUJI KAGAKU SHIKOGYO [JP]) [A] 1,17 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0378291  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 1; figure 7 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830405), vol. 007, no. 081, Database accession no. (M - 205), [A] 1,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860814), vol. 010, no. 234, Database accession no. (M - 507), [A] 1,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940706), vol. 018, no. 358, Database accession no. (M - 1633), [A] 1,17 * abstract *