Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995735

EP0995735 - Process for the preparation of cyclic alcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grund, Gerda, Dr.
Stolbergstrasse 61
48249 Dülmen / DE
02 / Günzel, Bernd, Dr.
Arenbergstrasse 26
45721 Haltern / DE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99117121.631.08.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814873022.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848730
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995735
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995735
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995735
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C29/52, C07C35/205
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/06]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung cyclischer Alkohole[2000/17]
English:Process for the preparation of cyclic alcohols[2000/17]
French:Procédé de préparation d'alcools cycliques[2000/17]
Examination procedure03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
13.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2002Fee for grant paid
09.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1486391  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [A] 1,3-5,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1549178  (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, DES CARBURANTS ET LUBRIFIANTS) [A] 1,4,5,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1035624  (ICI LTD) [A] 1,5-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3488740  (RUSSELL JOSEPH L) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]BE668681  (CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AG) [A] 1,4 * claim - *