Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977364

EP0977364 - Data signal controlled oscillator for a video display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON multimedia S.A.
46, quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Koblitz, Karl Rudolf
Im Speitel 53a
76229 Karlsruhe-Grötzingen / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Rossmanith, Manfred , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Rossmanith, Manfred , et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/05]Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr. , et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Postfach 61 01 31
30601 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99117351.920.02.1993
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateUS1992084307602.03.1992         Original published format: US 843076
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977364
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977364
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/08, H04N5/12, H03L7/14, H03L7/099
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2003/08]
Former [2000/42]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Durch ein Datensignal gesteuerter Oszillator für eine Videoanzeige[2000/05]
English:Data signal controlled oscillator for a video display[2000/05]
French:Oscillateur contrôlé par un signal de données pour un affichage vidéo[2000/05]
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
09.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2002Fee for grant paid
19.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93102714.8  / EP0559039
Opposition(s)20.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.11.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
15.11.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
15.11.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
15.11.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.11.1999
Documents cited:Search[X]US4568888  (KIMURA ROBERT K [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 40 - column 10, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0181658  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 22 - line 32 * * page 2, line 14 - line 32 * * page 3, line 13 - line 32 * * page 4, line 5 - line 35 * * page 5, line 8 - line 12 * * page 5, line 20 - line 30; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0360442  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 32 * * page 6, line 20 - line 37 * * page 12, line 55 - page 13, line 1; figures 7,16,33 *;
 [A]US4729024  (KAWAI HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 3; figures 1-4 *