Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0960733 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0960733



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 580
06.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.05.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.02.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.02.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.11.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.11.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
02.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
06.08.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 92
18.04.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2002 Description Search / examination 17
04.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.11.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.06.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
20.10.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 49
05.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
05.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 60
05.10.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 86
05.10.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 88
03.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
03.09.1999 Description Search / examination 73
03.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 15
03.09.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7