Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0960733


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.04.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
02.05.2003 (Expected) grant published on  18.06.2003  [2003/25]
21.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.11.2002 Renewal fee
07.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant
07.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.08.2002 Change - representative published on  18.09.2002  [2002/38]
25.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
10.01.2002 Examination report or reply
12.11.2001 Renewal fee
30.10.2001 Examination report or reply
22.06.2001 First examination report
21.06.2001 Examination report or reply
08.11.2000 Renewal fee
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
02.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
19.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
15.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.12.1999 [1999/48]
08.10.1999 Renewal fee