Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960733

EP0960733 - Ink jet print head and ink jet printing apparatus provided with said ink jet print head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Makiko, c/o Canon K. K.
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugitani, Hiroshi, c/o Canon K. K.
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Sugama, Sadayuki, c/o Canon K. K.
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Ishinaga, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon K. K.
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois , et al
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
Former [1999/48]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117364.218.10.1993
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateJP1992028027519.10.1992         Original published format: JP 28027592
JP1992028027619.10.1992         Original published format: JP 28027692
[1999/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0960733
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0960733
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960733
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/135, B41J2/16
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahldruckkopf und Tintenstrahldruckvorrichtung mit diesem Tintenstrahldruckkopf[1999/48]
English:Ink jet print head and ink jet printing apparatus provided with said ink jet print head[1999/48]
French:Tête d'impression par jet d'encre et dispositif d'impression par jet d'encre muni de cette tête[1999/48]
Examination procedure23.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
26.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93922649.4  / EP0631869
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0288247  ;
 [AD]EP0468712  (CANON KK [JP]) [AD] 2,3 * page 20, line 1 - line 30; figure 12 *;
 [AD]EP0389217  (AM INT [US]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900620), vol. 14, no. 285, Database accession no. (M - 0987), & JP02088247 A 19900328 (CANON K.K.) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3
by applicantJPH0618437
 US5121134