Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994640

EP0994640 - Method of making a circuit assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heinz, Helmut
Holbeinweg 6
91522 Ansbach / DE
02 / Schuch, Bernhard
Schlossbergstrasse 15
91616 Neusitz / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/05]
Former [2000/16]Mader, Wilfried
DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35
74025 Heilbronn / DE
Application number, filing date99117394.904.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814259017.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19842590
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994640
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994640
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994640
Date:19.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, H05K3/34
[2000/22]
Former International [2000/16]H05K1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/07]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schaltungsanordnungen[2000/16]
English:Method of making a circuit assembly[2000/16]
French:Procédé d' assemblage de circuits[2000/16]
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
05.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2002Fee for grant paid
18.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0869704  (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0055578  (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *