Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994159

EP0994159 - Curable organopolysiloxane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker-Chemie GmbH
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Fehn, Armin, Dr.
Fischerweg 18
84547 Emmerting / DE
02 / Achenbach, Frank, Dr.
Maria-Ward-Str. 52
84359 Simbach/Inn / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Budczinski, Angelika , et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Budczinski, Angelika , et al
Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Budczinski, Angelika , et al
c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung PML, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117453.309.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814709713.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847097
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994159
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994159
Date:04.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/07, C08K5/00, C07F15/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Härtbare Organopolysiloxanmassen[2000/16]
English:Curable organopolysiloxane composition[2000/16]
French:Composition d'organopolysiloxane durcissable[2000/16]
Examination procedure09.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
09.09.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
25.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.04.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2000Fee for grant paid
07.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
IE04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
GR06.07.2001
LU09.09.2001
MC09.09.2001
BE30.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2004/39]CY04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
IE04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
LU09.09.2001
MC09.09.2001
BE30.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2004/05]CY04.04.2001
FI04.04.2001
IE04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
MC09.09.2001
BE30.09.2001
ES30.10.2001
Former [2003/06]FI04.04.2001
IE04.04.2001
NL04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
MC09.09.2001
BE30.09.2001
Former [2002/48]FI04.04.2001
IE04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
MC09.09.2001
Former [2002/43]FI04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
MC09.09.2001
Former [2002/27]FI04.04.2001
PT04.07.2001
Former [2002/15]FI04.04.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US5525564  (MCAFEE RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0173512  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]DE4429411  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,8,9,11 *;
 [A]EP0638604  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 10 - line 55 * * claims 1,3-5 *;
 [A]US5328974  (MCAFEE RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *