Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993153

EP0993153 - Packet forwarding apparatus with a flow detection table [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Information Technology Co., Ltd.
1, Horiyamashita
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 259-1322 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yazaki, Takeki
448-7-202 Katakura-machi
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Aimoto, Takeshi
4-4-12-902 Sagamihara
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Sugai, Kazuo
No. 101 Raifu-suru-2, 1-7-21 Chuo
Ebina-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Matsuyama, Nobuhito
2547-13 Hirasawa
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstraße 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117476.410.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028220605.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28220698
JP1999004759125.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4759199
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993153
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993153
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/46, H04L12/44, H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Paketversendegerät mit einer Flussnachweistabelle[2000/15]
English:Packet forwarding apparatus with a flow detection table[2000/15]
French:Appareillage de réacheminement de paquets pourvu d'une table de mésure de flux[2000/15]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
22.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2005Fee for grant paid
06.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05008938.2  / EP1560373
EP06026816.6  / EP1764955
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5504743  (DREFENSTEDT REINHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 29 * * column 2, line 62 - line 65 * * column 4, line 49 - line 54 * [A] 14,15;
 [Y]WO9838771  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 10-12 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4, line 20 - line 31 *;
 [Y]US5636210  (AGRAWAL JAGANNATH P [US]) [Y] 16 * column 2, line 58 - line 62 * * column 3, line 18 - line 22 * * column 7, line 5 - line 44 *;
 [A]EP0871309  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 6, line 23 - line 42 * * column 7, line 12 - line 16 * * column 8, line 49 - line 58 * * column 10, line 2 - line 9 *
 [YA]  - SRINIVASAN V ET AL, "Fast and scalable layer four switching", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS REVIEW,US,ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0146-4833, page 191-202-202, XP002107832 [Y] 1-12,16 * page 191, column L, line 1 - line 24 * * page 191, column R, line 5 - line 48 * * page 192, column L, line 30 - column R, line 2 * * page 192, column R, line 40 - page 193, column L, line 46 * * page 193, column R, line 33 - line 48 * * page 195, column R, line 10 - line 31 * * page 196, column R, line 46 - line 60 * * page 199, column L, line 13 - line 28 * [A] 13-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/285243.285282