EP0985467 - Transfer device with failure protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHULER PRESSEN GmbH & Co. Bahnhofstrasse 41 73033 Göppingen / DE | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greiner, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hauptstrasse 45 73092 Heiningen / DE | 02 /
Rieger, Walter Lessingstrasse 34 73037 Göppingen / DE | 03 /
Thudium, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Ringstrasse 10 73116 Wäschenbeuren / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99117625.6 | 07.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998141621 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841621 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985467 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985467 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/02, B21D43/05, B65G25/02 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
B21D43/02 (EP,US);
B21D43/055 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | B21D43/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | Transfereinrichtung mit Ausfallschutz | [2000/11] | English: | Transfer device with failure protection | [2000/11] | French: | Dispositif de transfert avec protection de défaillance | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3329900 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0701872 (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5566814 (HOFELE HANS [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3329900 |