Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009076

EP1009076 - Device for conveying a wire independently at each end [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi
Mie / JP
For all designated states
Autonetworks Technologies, Ltd.
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi / JP
For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
For all designated states
AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP
For all designated states
Harness System Technologies Research, Ltd.
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kometani, Toshio, Harness System Tech. Research Ltd
7-10, Kikuzumi 1-chome, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99117900.310.09.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998035001309.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35001398
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1009076
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1009076
Date:06.09.2000
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R43/28
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Endunabhängige Kabelzuführungsvorrichtung[2005/18]
English:Device for conveying a wire independently at each end[2000/24]
French:Dispositif pour transporter un câble indépendamment à chaque extrémité[2000/24]
Former [2000/24]Endunabhängige Kabelzuführungvorrichtung
Examination procedure06.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
03.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/11]
14.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3029494  (ANDREN KARL H) [X] 1,3 * column 9, lines 46-50 - column 10, lines 33-45; figure 7 * * column 6, lines 30-44 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US3701301  (GUDMESTAD RAGNAR) [Y] 2 * figure 4; claim 1 *