Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022627

EP1022627 - Device and method for the control of decalcification of a filter-machine heater [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PCS Process Control Systems GmbH Gesellschaft für Steuerungs- und Automationstechnik
Badenweiler Strasse 4
79115 Freiburg / DE
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Pollak-Diener, Gerhard, Dr.
Kreuzlinger Strasse 59
82110 Germering / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118044.922.09.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateDE199910101113.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901011
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022627
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
Extension statesAL15.12.2000
LT15.12.2000
LV15.12.2000
MK15.12.2000
RO15.12.2000
SI15.12.2000
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Entkalkung einer Filtermaschinenheizung[2000/30]
English:Device and method for the control of decalcification of a filter-machine heater[2000/30]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour commander le détartrage d'un élément chauffant d'un appareil à filtre[2000/30]
Examination procedure15.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
31.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/45]
07.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2002
30.09.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5375508  (KNEPLER JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,12,13 * column 3, line 38 - column 11, line 68; figures 1,1A,4 * [Y] 5,6;
 [Y]US5455887  (DAM NICOLAAS M F [NL]) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 11; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5402705  (BAILLEUX JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *