Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992525

EP0992525 - Process of preparation of biodegradable polymers having recurring succinyl units [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2002/16]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schubart, Ruediger, Dr.
An der Engelsfuhr 27
51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date99118056.322.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814563905.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19845639
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992525
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992525
Date:17.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G73/10, C08G69/10
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/43]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von biologisch abbaubaren Polymeren mit wiederkehrenden Succinyleinheiten[2000/15]
English:Process of preparation of biodegradable polymers having recurring succinyl units[2000/15]
French:Procédé de préparation de polymères biodegradables contenant des unités succinyl répétitives[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
25.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2002Fee for grant paid
21.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.09.2002
ES23.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
[2004/28]
Former [2004/03]AT22.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
Former [2003/51]BE30.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
Former [2003/47]DK30.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19532717  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 32 - page 2, line 52 *;
 [A]DE4221875  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * in der Anmeldung erwähnt.; page 3, line 61 - page 3, line 64 * * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]DE4023463  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * in der Anmeldung erwähnt. * * page 3, line 30 - page 3, line 64 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4342316  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *