Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992534

EP0992534 - Curable rubber compositions comprising an epoxide plasticizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.08.2007  [2007/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia
Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
Lanxess Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Bayer Inc.
1265 Vidal Street South
Sarnia, ON N7T 7M2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Von Hellens, Carl Walter
1953 Winslow Crescent
Bright's Grove, Ontario N0N 1C0 / CA
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Birgid , et al
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH
LEX-IPR
Kennedyplatz 1
50569 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/49]Wichmann, Birgid , et al
Lanxess Deutschland GmbH LIP-IPR
51369 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2005/30]Zobel, Manfred, Dr. , et al
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH, LIP-IPR Building Q 18
51369 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2003/45]Schneider, Jürgen, Dr. , et al
Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2000/15]Feldhues, Michael L.F., Dr. , et al
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99118073.823.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateCA1998224919305.10.1998         Original published format: CA 2249193
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992534
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992534
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/15, C08L21/00, A63B37/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vulkanisierbare Gummizusammensetzung mit einem Epoxid-Weichmacher[2000/15]
English:Curable rubber compositions comprising an epoxide plasticizer[2000/15]
French:Composition de caoutchouc durcissable contenant un plastifiant epoxyde[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
23.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2005
06.10.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.10.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2006Fee for grant paid
20.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5830946  (OZAWA OZAMU [JP], et al) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH09111045  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-12