Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968969

EP0968969 - Process of producing silica glass products used for photolithography and optical members produced by the process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/30]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8331 / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hiraiwa, Hiroyuki
c/o Nikon Corp.
Intel. Prop. HQ
3-2-3 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
 [2011/40]
Former [2000/01]01 / Hiraiwa, Hiroyuki
c/o Nikon Corp., Intel. Prop. HQ, 3-2-3 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2000/01]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118092.828.03.1996
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1995007016528.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7016595
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968969
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968969
Date:22.01.2003
[2003/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968969
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C03B19/14, C03B32/00
[2003/03]
Former International [2000/01]C03B19/14, C03C3/06, G02B13/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Quarzglaskörpern für Photolithographie und die mit dem Verfahren hergestellten optischen Elemente[2000/01]
English:Process of producing silica glass products used for photolithography and optical members produced by the process[2000/01]
French:Procédé de fabrication de corps en verre de silice pour photolithography et les éléments optiques obtenus par le procédé[2000/01]
Examination procedure04.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2011Fee for grant paid
19.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96104958.2  / EP0735006
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960104958) is  21.11.1996
Opposition(s)06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 15
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS6424032  ;
 [XY]EP0525984  (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD [JP], et al) [X] 4-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 38; example 1 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 57 * [Y] 1;
 [DA]JPH06234531
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890515), vol. 13, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 595), & JP01024032 A 19890126 (SHIN-ETSU QUARTZ PRODUCTS CO., LTD.) [X] 4,5 * abstract * [Y] 1
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941121), vol. 18, no. 610, Database accession no. (C - 1276), & JP06234531 A 19940823 (NIKON CORP.) [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH06234531
 US5253110
 US5333035
 US5365051
 US5379091