Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083723

EP1083723 - Data routing means and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.07.2002  [2002/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Hameleers, Heino
Loysonstr. 8
6471 VN Kerkrade / NL
02 / Hundscheidt, Frank
Spiesstr. 63
6463 BK Kerkrade / NL
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118117.310.09.1999
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083723
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04N7/15, H04L12/64, H04Q7/22
[2001/11]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/49]
Former [2001/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Datenleitweglenkung[2001/11]
English:Data routing means and method[2001/11]
French:Dispositif et procédé de routage de données[2001/11]
Examination procedure15.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/30]
17.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.10.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.10.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9943172  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-10,12-14,16-27,29-31 * page 3, line 17 - page 7, line 20 * * page 7, line 35 - page 13, line 13 * * page 15, line 1 - page 17, line 30 * [A] 11,15,28,32;
 [A]  LINDBERGH D, "THE H.324 MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION STANDARD", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, (19961201), vol. 34, no. 12, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 46 - 51, XP000636453 [A] 1-32 * page 46, column R, line 19 - line 30 * * page 47, column L, line 42 - page 48, column R, line 47 * * page 49, column L, line 31 - column R, line 23 * * page 50, column R, line 43 - page 51, column L, line 41 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.556486