Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974536

EP0974536 - Transportable collecting container for waste materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2001 [2001/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georg, Edgar
Auf der Seelhardt 10
D-57638 Neitersen / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Langmaack, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte
Maxton & Langmaack
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99118119.911.03.1997
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE1996204644U13.03.1996         Original published format: DE 29604644 U
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974536
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65F3/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Transportierbarer Sammelcontainer für Abfallstoffe[2000/04]
English:Transportable collecting container for waste materials[2000/04]
French:Récipient collecteur transportable pour déchets[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/28]
22.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/28]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97104069.6  / EP0795493
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200004   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2000
31.03.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5141280  (D. GERRARD) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]DE9417594U  (J. ROCHOLL) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 11 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]US3757969  (H. SMITH) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 65; figures 1-3 *