Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994262

EP0994262 - Attachment device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Hennemann, Karl-Heinz
Hanauer Weg 23
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
02 / Tandler, Peter
Krontaler Weg 5
61479 Kronberg/Ts. / DE
03 / König, Harald
Gartenstrasse 7
61239 Ober-Mörlen / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99118149.611.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814732314.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847323
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994262
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994262
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16B9/00, F16B5/10, B60T11/26, F16B21/02
[2002/38]
Former International [2000/16]F16B9/00, F16B5/10, B60T11/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsvorrichtung[2000/16]
English:Attachment device[2000/16]
French:Dispositif de fixation[2000/16]
Examination procedure18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
10.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB561395  (FRANK JARRETT) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,13 * page 6, line 62 - page 7, line 37; figures 1-3 * [Y] 10,12;
 [X]DE8204505U  (RAYMOND A) [X] 1-7,13 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 9; figure - *;
 [Y]GB2240134  (ZHANG NING) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US3811157  (SCHENK P) [Y] 12 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]DE4115063  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
by applicantDE4115063