Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971393

EP0971393 - Method of fabricating a capacitor for integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]Capacitor for integrated circuit and its fabrication method
[2001/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
1-1, Saiwai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uemoto, Yasuhiro
2-2-31, Nakanosho
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520 / JP
02 / Fujii, Eiji
3-2-3-808, Shirakawa
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
03 / Shimada, Yasuhiro
10-1-410, minamikakiuchi, Terado-cho
Muko-shi, Kyoto 617-0002 / JP
04 / Azuma, Masamichi
4-20-411, Akibadai, Otsu-shi
Shiga 520-0822 / JP
05 / Arita, Koji
2-1-6-601, Awaji, Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-0032 / JP
06 / Nagano, Yoshihisa
2-1-C-11-203, Takemidai
Suita-shi, Osaka 565 / JP
07 / Inoue, Atsuo
8-5, R-305, Enmyoji Toriimae, Oyamasaki-cho
Otokuni-gun, Kyoto 618 / JP
08 / Izutsu, Yasufumi
20-15, Ninotsubo, Shoryuji
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP
[2000/19]
Former [2000/02]01 / Uemoto, Yasuhiro
2-2-31, Nakanosho
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520 / JP
02 / Fujii, Eiji
3-2-3-808, Shirakawa
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
03 / Shimada, Yasuhiro
Room No. 421, 2-1-2, Yamasaki, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618 / JP
04 / Azuma, Masamichi
1-3-5-502, Wakayamadai, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618 / JP
05 / Arita, Koji
1-1-12-207, Higashinakajima, Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 533 / JP
06 / Nagano, Yoshihisa
2-1-C-11-203, Takemidai
Suita-shi, Osaka 565 / JP
07 / Inoue, Atsuo
8-5, R-305, Enmyoji Toriimae, Oyamasaki-cho
Otokuni-gun, Kyoto 618 / JP
08 / Izutsu, Yasufumi
20-15, Ninotsubo, Shoryuji
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99118171.006.12.1995
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1994032781828.12.1994         Original published format: JP 32781894
JP1995019457831.07.1995         Original published format: JP 19457895
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971393
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971393
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/02, H01L21/8239
[2001/48]
Former International [2000/02]H01L21/02, H01L21/8247
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren eines Kondensators für integrierte Schaltkreise[2001/48]
English:Method of fabricating a capacitor for integrated circuit[2001/48]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un condensateur pour un circuit intégré[2001/48]
Former [2000/02]Kondensator für integrierten Schaltkreis und sein Herstellungsverfahren
Former [2000/02]Capacitor for integrated circuit and its fabrication method
Former [2000/02]Condensateur pour un circuit intégré et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure07.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
15.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2002Fee for grant paid
20.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95119216.0  / EP0720213
Opposition(s)20.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DY]EP0404295  (RAMTRON CORP [US]) [DY] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [DY]JPS6430252  ;
 [A]EP0557937  (RAMTRON INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0503078  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9410084  (SYMETRIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 6, line 31 - page 12, line 32; figures 2-8 *
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890522), vol. 013, no. 218, Database accession no. (E - 761), [DY] 1-3 * abstract *