blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990384


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
30.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
01.10.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.11.2004  [2004/47]
24.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
25.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.08.2004  [2004/33]
07.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.06.2004  [2004/26]
23.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
10.10.2003 (Expected) grant published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
09.10.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.10.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.11.2002 Examination report or reply
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
23.08.2002 First examination report
20.08.2002 Examination report or reply
13.07.2002 Change - representative published on  28.08.2002  [2002/35]
10.10.2001 Renewal fee
27.12.2000 Change - extension states
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
13.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  29.11.2000 [2000/48]
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]