blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990384
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59907842D 08.01.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE19844894 30.09.1998
DE59907842 15.09.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0990384Global Dossier 26.11.2003B1
EP0990384 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19844894 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT254832T 15.12.2003T
Priority number Date
DE19844894 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19844894 06.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19844894 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6290599 18.09.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19844894 30.09.1998