Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990384

EP0990384 - Adjusting arrangement for an agricultural harvesting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstr. 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eis, Günter
Erlenweg 8
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
02 / Isfort, Heinrich
Rödder 22
48249 Dülmen / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/35]
Former [2000/14]Weeg, Thomas
Claas KGaA, Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Application number, filing date99118282.515.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814489430.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844894
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990384
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990384
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01F12/28
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Verstelleinrichtung einer landwirtschaftlichen Erntemaschine[2000/14]
English:Adjusting arrangement for an agricultural harvesting machine[2000/14]
French:Mécanisme de réglage pour une machine agricole de récolte[2000/14]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
23.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2003Fee for grant paid
30.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
IE26.11.2003
IT26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
ES09.03.2004
PT26.04.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]CY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
IE26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
ES09.03.2004
Former [2004/46]FI26.11.2003
IE26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
ES09.03.2004
Former [2004/41]FI26.11.2003
IE26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/40]FI26.11.2003
IE26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/33]FI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE26.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2655119  (FAHR AG MASCHF) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,12 * page 4 - page 10 * * figure - *;
 [A]GB1301363  (MASSEY FERGUSON INC.) [A] 1,4,5,7,10 * page 3, line 105 - page 4, line 10 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE19538199  (FORTSCHRITT ERNTEMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 2; figures 2,4-8 *;
 [A]DE9107689U  (CLAAS SALGAU GMBH) [A] 9,10 * page 2 - page 3 * * figure - *