Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987230

EP0987230 - Dielectric ceramic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD.
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD
14-18, Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takase, Masanori, C/O NGK Spark plug Co., Ltd.
No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Yokoi, Hitoshi, C/O NGK Spark plug Co., Ltd.
No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Ohbayashi, Kazushige, C/O NGK Spark plug Co., Ltd.
No. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118329.415.09.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateJP1998026165616.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26165698
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987230
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987230
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987230
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/46, H01P1/205
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/15]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dielektrischer keramischer Werkstoff[2000/12]
English:Dielectric ceramic material[2000/12]
French:Matériau céramique diélectrique[2000/12]
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
01.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2004Fee for grant paid
19.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
IT30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
DE01.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/32]FI30.06.2004
FR30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
DE01.10.2004
Former [2005/30]FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
DE01.10.2004
Former [2005/02]FI30.06.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5320991  (TAKAHASHI HISAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - line 11 * * column 2, line 40 - line 66 * * table 2 * * claim 4 * [A] 3-18
Examination   Specification sheet from Merck KGaA, Darmstadt, Product no. 100805, titanium dioxide extra pure (99%),