Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989683

EP0989683 - Mobile phone with SIM card reader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Bläcker, Bernhard
Geyersknappen 14
57580 Gebhardshein / DE
02 / Scheiba, Frank
Bergflagge 150
48249 Dülmen / DE
03 / Petterson, Juha-Pekka
annalantie 6B 6
36200 Kangsala / FI
04 / Malmlund, Heikki
Ahlmanintie 43
33800 Tampere / FI
05 / Sirola, Jukka
Lehtiladonkuja 1 C 10
33580 Tampere / FI
06 / Peter, Detlef
Leipheimer Strasse 39
89346 Bibertal / DE
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/28]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/13]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118335.115.09.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateDE199814370123.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19843701
[2000/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989683
Date:29.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989683
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989683
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/38, H04M1/72, H04Q7/32, H04B1/16, H04M1/725
[2003/51]
Former International [2000/13]H04B1/38, H04M1/72
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
TitleGerman:Mobiltelefon mit SIM-Kartenleser[2000/13]
English:Mobile phone with SIM card reader[2000/13]
French:Téléphone mobile avec lecteur SIM[2000/13]
Examination procedure08.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2006Fee for grant paid
27.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.06.2006
IE28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
AT15.09.2006
LU15.09.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
CH30.09.2006
LI30.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]IE28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
AT15.09.2006
LU15.09.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
CH30.09.2006
LI30.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2008/21]IE28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
AT15.09.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
GR29.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
CH30.09.2006
LI30.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2008/17]IE28.06.2006
IT28.06.2006
AT15.09.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
CH30.09.2006
LI30.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/30]IE28.06.2006
DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
BE30.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/22]DK28.09.2006
SE28.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2007/18]SE28.09.2006
ES09.10.2006
PT28.11.2006
Former [2006/49]SE28.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE4321381  (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * zusammenfassung *; column 2, line 37 - line 52 * * column 3, line 9 - column 17 * * column 3, line 37 - line 48 * * claims 1-7 * [A] 7-9 [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]US5418837  (JOHANSSON KJELL [SE], et al) [Y] 4-6 * zusammenfassung *; column 4, line 34 - line 50; figure 1A * * column 6, line 43 - line 51; figure 3 *;
 [DXA]US5353328  (JOKIMIES MATTI [FI]) [DX] 1,3 * zusammenfassung * [A] 2,4-9;
 [A]DE4128686  (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 7 - line 55 * * column 2, line 35 - line 59 *;
 [A]US4908523  (SNOWDEN GREGORY O [US], et al) [A] 7-9 * zusammenfassung *