blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0994151


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.03.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
04.08.2006 Correction of patent specification published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
10.02.2006 (Expected) grant published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
14.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.01.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.09.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.04.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.04.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
14.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.04.2003 Examination report or reply
11.12.2002 Examination report or reply
27.08.2002 Renewal fee
16.08.2001 Renewal fee
20.07.2001 First examination report
18.07.2001 Examination report or reply
09.01.2001 Change - extension states
17.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
14.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.2000 [2000/35]
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]