blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0994151
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4717976BGlobal Dossier 06.07.2011B2
JP2000109696 18.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US16733798 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0994151Global Dossier 06.09.2006B9
EP0994151 29.03.2006B1
EP0994151 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US16733798 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69930571T 12.10.2006T2
DE69930571D 18.05.2006D1
Priority number Date
US16733798 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6153691 28.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US16733798 07.10.1998