blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0994151

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure02.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted29.03.2006
Opposition procedure02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 02.05.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:30.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000706
 
Event date:03.01.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010319
 
Event date:29.03.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:29.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:18.05.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69930571
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060518
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:03.11.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:02.05.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070102
 
Event date:24.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69930571 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE
 
Event date:16.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:10.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:13.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180904
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180813
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180912
Year of Fee Payment:20