Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994151

EP0994151 - Thermoplastic silicone vulcanizates prepared by condensation cure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gornowitz, Gerald Alphonse
4613 Bristol Court
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
02 / Zhang, Hongxi
802 Adams Street
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date99118344.316.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998016733707.10.1998         Original published format: US 167337
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994151
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994151
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0994151
Date:06.09.2006
[2006/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/02, C08L77/00, C08L75/04, C08L53/00, C08L83/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Thermoplastische Silikonvulkanisate hergestellt durch Kondensationshärtung[2000/16]
English:Thermoplastic silicone vulcanizates prepared by condensation cure[2000/16]
French:Vulcanisés thermoplastiques de silicones durcis par condensation[2000/16]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
19.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2006Fee for grant paid
02.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2757528  (DOW CORNING [GB]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 30 - line 34 * * page 4, line 13 - line 15 * * page 5, line 14 - line 18 * * examples 1-4; claim - *;
 [DA]US4970263  (ARKLES BARRY C [US], et al) [DA] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [A]US4803244  (UMPLEBY JEFFREY D [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 1 - line 4; claim -; table 1 *