Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992474

EP0992474 - Process for transferring alpha,beta-unsaturated alkyl groups to electrophiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chemetall GmbH
Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2001/04]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Metallgesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft
Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Philip, Dr., Merck Sharp and Dohme
Neuroscience Centre, Terlings Park
Harlow, Essex CM20 8QR / GB
02 / Knochel, Paul, Professor Dr.
Friedrichstrasse 8
35037 Marburg / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Uppena, Franz , et al
Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE
[2008/30]
Former [2000/51]Uppena, Franz, Dr. , et al
Dynamit Nobel AG Patentabteilung
53839 Troisdorf / DE
Application number, filing date99118371.616.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814649709.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846497
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992474
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992474
Date:09.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07B41/02, C07B41/06, C07B43/04, C07C29/40
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Übertragung von alpha, beta-ungesättigten Alkylgruppen auf Elektrophile[2001/14]
English:Process for transferring alpha,beta-unsaturated alkyl groups to electrophiles[2000/15]
French:Procédé pour le transfert de groupes alkyles alpha,béta-insaturés sur des électrophiles[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]Verfahren zur Übertragung von alpha, Beta-ungesättigten Alkylgruppen auf Elektrophile
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
10.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2002Fee for grant paid
26.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]  - J. NOKAMI, "New concept in allylation of aldehydes: regiospecific allylation of aldehydes by an allyl-transfer reaction of homoallylic alcohols", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (19980708), vol. 120, no. 26, pages 6609 - 6610, XP002101392 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9810742
 [A]  - F. BARBOT, "SYNTHESE D'ALCOOLS beta-ETHYLENIQUES POSSEDANT UN MOTIF ISOPRENIQUE A PARTIR D'ORGANOMETALLIQUES DE TYPE PRENYLIQUE (CH3)2C=CHCH2M", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (1975), no. 44, pages 3829 - 3832, XP002101393 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - P. MIGINIAC, "Transposition d'un alcool beta-éthylénique au sein d'un organozincique alpha-éthylénique", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, PARIS FR, (1968), no. 11, pages 4675 - 4676, XP002101394 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - P. JONES, "Preparation and reactions of masked allylic organozinc reagents", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (19990108), vol. 64, no. 1, pages 186 - 195, XP002125154 [PX] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo981623m