blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997426

EP0997426 - Work assist device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2009/07]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Konosu, Hitoshi
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
02 / Yoji, Yamada
Mechano-Informatics and Systems, Department of Mechanical Science and Engineering, Graduate School of Engineering, Nagoya University
Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 464-8603 / JP
 [2009/22]
Former [2009/03]01 / Konosu, Hitoshi
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
02 / Yoji, Yamada
c/o Toyota School Foundation 2-12-1, Hisakata
Tempaku-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 468-8511 / JP
Former [2000/18]01 / Konosu, Hitoshi
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
02 / Yamada, Yoji
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/18]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118380.716.09.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998026334817.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26334898
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997426
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997426
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997426
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2003
ClassificationIPC:B66C23/00, B25J9/00, B25J3/04, B25J13/08
[2003/37]
CPC:
B25J9/0018 (EP,US); B25J5/04 (EP,US); B25J9/046 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36429 (EP,US); G05B2219/40119 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/18]B66C23/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/23]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Arbeitshilfsvorrichtung[2000/18]
English:Work assist device[2000/18]
French:Dispositif d'assistance de travail[2000/18]
Examination procedure21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5551308  (ARAI HIROHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [XA]  - KAZEROONI H, "Extender: a case study for human-robot interaction via transfer of power and information signals", ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATION, 1993. PROCEEDINGS., 2ND IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TOKYO, JAPAN 3-5 NOV. 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19931103), ISBN 0-7803-1407-7, pages 10 - 20, XP010126436 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROMAN.1993.367756
 [X]  - KAZEROONI H, "HUMAN-ROBOT INTERACTION VIA THE TRANSFER OF POWER AND INFORMATION SIGNALS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19900301), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9472, pages 450 - 463, XP000164962 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/21.52555
 [X]  - KOSUGE K ET AL, "Control Of Mechanical System With Man-machine Interaction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS. RALEIGH, NC., JULY 7 - 10, 1992, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920707), vol. 1 _, ISBN 0-7803-0738-0, pages 87 - 92, XP010223025 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.