Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990822

EP0990822 - Seal packing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Latty, Cyril Xavier
6 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny
92210 Saint-Cloud / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Schieschke, Klaus
Patentanwälte
Eder & Schieschke
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke, Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118395.516.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814544202.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19845442
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990822
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990822
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990822
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/20, F16J15/22, D02G3/44
[2001/06]
Former International [2000/14]F16J15/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dichtungspackung[2000/14]
English:Seal packing[2000/14]
French:Garniture d'étanchéité[2000/14]
Examination procedure29.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
05.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2002Fee for grant paid
15.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0482489  (CARRARA SERGIO [IT]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, lines 1-11 * * column 2, lines 26-34 * * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4;
 [XA]EP0790339  (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * page 6, line 10 * * page 6, lines 16,17 * * page 11, lines 44-52 * [A] 4;
 [A]EP0779460  (LATTY INT [FR]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 2 * * claims 7,9 *;
 [A]US4559862  (CASE EDWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1,3-6 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 56 * * column 7, lines 4-22 *